Book contents
- Frontmatter
- Contents
- List of tables
- List of acronyms
- About the author
- Acknowledgements
- one Introduction
- two The old regime: provision for disabled people before the welfare state
- three Promotional welfare, 1948–63
- four The emergence of disabled people, 1964–69
- five Cinderella of the welfare state: legislation for disabled people, 1970–72
- six The final days: disability at the end of the welfare state, 1973–79
- seven The last waltz: epilogue
- eight Conclusions
- Appendix: Ministerial periods of office
- Bibliography
- Index
Appendix: Ministerial periods of office
Published online by Cambridge University Press: 01 September 2022
- Frontmatter
- Contents
- List of tables
- List of acronyms
- About the author
- Acknowledgements
- one Introduction
- two The old regime: provision for disabled people before the welfare state
- three Promotional welfare, 1948–63
- four The emergence of disabled people, 1964–69
- five Cinderella of the welfare state: legislation for disabled people, 1970–72
- six The final days: disability at the end of the welfare state, 1973–79
- seven The last waltz: epilogue
- eight Conclusions
- Appendix: Ministerial periods of office
- Bibliography
- Index
Summary
Anthony Barber, Chancellor of the Exchequer, 25 July 1970–4 March 1974
Tony Benn, Minister of Technology, 4 July 1966–19 June 1970
Ernest Bevin, Minister of Labour and National Service, 13 May 1940–23 May 1945
Rab Butler, Chancellor of the Exchequer, 28 October 1951–20 December 1955
Barbara Castle, Secretary of State for Social Services, 5 March 1974–8 April 1976
Richard Crossman, Secretary of State for Health and Social Services, 1 November 1968–19 June 1970
Judith Hart, Minister of Social Security, 26 July 1967–1 November 1968
Peggy Herbison, Minister of Pensions and National Insurance, Minister of Social Security, 18 October 1964–26 July 1967
Keith Joseph, Secretary of State for Health and Social Services, 19 June 1970–4 March 1974
Walter Monckton, Minister of Labour and National Service, 28 October 1951–20 December 1955
Enoch Powell, Minister of Health, 27 July 1960–19 October 1963
Kenneth Robinson, Minister of Health, 18 October 1964–1 November 1968
William Ross, Secretary of State for Scotland, 18 October 1964–19 June 1970
Margaret Thatcher, Secretary of State for Education and Science, 20 June 1970–4 March 1974
Peter Thorneycroft, Chancellor of the Exchequer, 13 January 1957–6 January 1958
Robin Turton, Minister of Health, 20 December 1955–16 January 1957
Dennis Vosper, Minister of Health, 17 January 1957–16 September 1957
Derek Walker-Smith, Minister of Health, 17 September 1957–26 July 1960
- Type
- Chapter
- Information
- Disability and the Welfare State in BritainChanges in Perception and Policy 1948-79, pp. 247 - 248Publisher: Bristol University PressPrint publication year: 2016